Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsored by
Senator Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing, for purposes of filing a petition for U Nonimmigrant Status, a victim or victim's family member to request a certifying official to certify victim helpfulness on a Form I-918, Supplement B certification; providing that, for the purpose of the Act, a victim shall be considered to be helpful, have been helpful, or likely to be helpful to the detection, investigation, or prosecution of a qualifying criminal activity; requiring the certifying official to sign and complete the certification in a specified manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2016 2/17/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-929, 11-930 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM