Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National Standards
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a definition of "disseminate" to exclude providing information to victims of crime or their representatives; altering the purposes of specified provisions of law relating to the Criminal Justice Information System; and requiring the Department of Information Technology to conduct a specified study relating to interfaces used for automated victim notification and to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2017.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1525
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National Standards
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-201, 10-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM