Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - Recommendations
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Workgroup on Public Safety and Policing) and Senators Pugh, Guzzone, McFadden, Miller, Ramirez, Raskin, and Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a complaint against a law enforcement officer alleging brutality in the execution of the officer's duties to be signed under the penalty of perjury instead of before an official authorized to administer oaths; authorizing an individual who has a video recording to file a brutality complaint against a law enforcement officer; altering the time period within which a specified complaint against a law enforcement officer may be filed; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016, October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {888871/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {823923/1
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Proceedings
58
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2016 2/17/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments {888871/2 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {823923/1 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin) 58
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-104, 3-107, 3-201, 3-202, 3-203, 3-204, 3-206 through 3-209, 3-514 through 3-519, 3-801 through 3-806, 4-601 through 4-604 )
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM