Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Forfeiture of Bail Bonds
Sponsored by
Senators Muse and Conway
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law that prohibits a court that exercises criminal jurisdiction from refunding a forfeiture of bail or collateral at a specified time unless a private surety pays a forfeiture of bail or collateral within a specified time; and repealing specified conditions that must be met before the court may refund a forfeited bail bond or collateral that was not paid within a specified time.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0631
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/13/2014 Text - First - Forfeiture of Bail Bonds
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM