Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensing and License Renewal - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness Course
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Guzzone, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Robinson, Rosapepe, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified applicants and licensees to complete a specified domestic violence and sexual assault awareness course to qualify for specified licenses or the renewal of a license by the State Board of Cosmetologists beginning on October 1, 2018; requiring the Board to adopt specified regulations; requiring the Board to waive a specified course requirement under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensing and License Renewal - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness Course
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-201, 5-205, 5-304, 5-305, 5-311, 5-611 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM