Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Prohibited Patient Referrals - Exceptions
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that specified prohibitions on referrals do not apply to a health care practitioner who has a specified beneficial interest or compensation arrangement that fits specified exceptions in federal law or regulation; providing that specified prohibitions on referrals do not apply to a health care practitioner who has a specified beneficial interest or compensation arrangement for which the federal Department of Health and Human Services has issued a specified waiver; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0929
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2016 2/17/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-301, 1-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM