Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015 - Worcester County - Delmarva Discovery Center and Museum
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015 to add the Board of Directors of the Delmarva Discovery Center & Museum, Inc. as a grantee to a specified grant.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1572
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2016 2/17/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed 39
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 First Reading Appropriations 43
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2016 3/19/2016 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 49
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Second Reading Passed 49
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 50
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Returned Passed 48A
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM