Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Emergency Management Agency - Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations Office - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations Office within the Maryland Emergency Management Agency (MEMA) to help improve statewide cybersecurity readiness and response; requiring the Director of MEMA to appoint an Executive Director as head of the Office; requiring the Office to be provided with sufficient staff to perform the Office's functions; requiring the Office to establish regional assistance groups to deliver or coordinate support services to political subdivisions, agencies, or regions; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1618
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
51A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland Emergency Management Agency - Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations Office - Establishment
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51A
Text - Third - Maryland Emergency Management Agency - Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations Office - Establishment
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 52
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 51A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-101, 14-104.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:31 PM