Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Emergency Management Agency - Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations Office - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations Office within the Maryland Emergency Management Agency (MEMA) to help improve statewide cybersecurity readiness and response; requiring the Director of MEMA to appoint an Executive Director as head of the Office; requiring the Office to be provided with sufficient staff to perform the Office's functions; requiring the Office to establish regional assistance groups to deliver or coordinate support services to political subdivisions, agencies, or regions; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1618
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland Emergency Management Agency - Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations Office - Establishment
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Emergency Management Agency - Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations Office - Establishment
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 51AClick to view Recorded Media
(   14-101, 14-104.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:31 PM
Click to return on the top page