Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Allegany County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution to Cumberland Historic Cemetery Organization
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of County Commissioners of Allegany County to set an additional fee of $13 for each marriage license; requiring the clerk to pay the proceeds from the additional fee to the general fund of the county each month; and requiring the Board of County Commissioners to distribute the proceeds to the Cumberland Historic Cemetery Organization.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1444
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2014 2/14/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM