Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Programs - Authorized in All Counties
Sponsored by
Senators Hershey, Klausmeier, Shank, and Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing a circuit administrative judge to establish a Truancy Reduction Pilot Program in the juvenile court in any county in the administrative judge's circuit; and requiring the Chief Judge of the Court of Appeals to consult with the administrative judges of the counties in which a Truancy Reduction Pilot Program has been established before accepting a gift or grant to implement the pilot programs in each respective circuit.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2014 2/14/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM