Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – Overweight Vehicles – Heavy Weight Port Corridor Permit
Sponsored by
Senator Salling
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of Transportation to determine that a vehicle or combination of vehicles transporting certain freight is an indivisible load authorized to obtain a certain overweight vehicle permit under certain circumstances; establishing certain conditions for a vehicle issued a permit under the Act, including a requirement to travel only on roads designated as being part of a "heavy weight port corridor"; establishing a certain maximum gross vehicle weight for a vehicle with a certain permit; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Highway Administration - Overweight Vehicle Permits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {868779/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {540913/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - State Highway Administration - Overweight Vehicle Permits
Senate 3/05/2019 3/06/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {868779/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Overweight Vehicles – Heavy Weight Port Corridor Permit
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53A
House 3/28/2019 3/29/2019 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {540913/1 Adopted 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 63
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws – Overweight Vehicles – Heavy Weight Port Corridor Permit
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws – Overweight Vehicles – Heavy Weight Port Corridor Permit
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-109, 24-113.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM