Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Water and Sewer and Solid Waste Management Plan Approval
Sponsored by
Senators Ready, Bates, Eckardt, Edwards, and Salling
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Reducing the number of days from 90 to 60 that the Department of the Environment has to take specified actions on a proposed county plan or a proposed revision or amendment to a county plan; reducing the number of days from 90 to 45 for an extension of a specified review period; authorizing an additional extension of time for a specified review period, subject to specified notice requirements; requiring a written notice to include specified information; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Water and Sewer Plan Approval
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {974431/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment - Water and Sewer Plan Approval
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {700012/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Environment - Water and Sewer Plan Approval
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {974431/1 Adopted 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Environment - Water and Sewer Plan Approval
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 44
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 46
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {700012/1 Adopted 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Environment - Water and Sewer and Solid Waste Management Plan Approval
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Text - Chapter - Environment - Water and Sewer and Solid Waste Management Plan Approval
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-507 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM