Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Sparrows Point Steel Mill Remembrance Monument
Sponsored by
Senator Stone
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $200,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the County Executive and County Council of Baltimore County for specified development or improvement purposes related to the Sparrows Point Steel Mill Remembrance Monument, located in Baltimore County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0901
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2014 2/17/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/19/2014 2/20/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/08 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM