Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Sheriff and County Commissioners - Salaries
Sponsored by
Senators Shank, Edwards, and Young
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that the Sheriff of Washington County shall receive a salary that is the greater of $100,000 or the salary set by the County Commissioners of Washington County under specified provisions of law; requiring the County Commissioners of Washington County to set the salaries for specified local offices by local law, within a specified time frame and subject to specified conditions; providing that the County Commissioners of Washington County shall receive a specified salary; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1399
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {898373/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2014 2/17/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Favorable with Amendments {898373/1 Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 53
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 57
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   28-207, 28-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM