Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Robbery or Theft of Property - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsored by
Senator Stone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that the crime of robbery includes robbing or attempting to rob another of specified controlled dangerous substances; clarifying that the crime of theft includes the theft of controlled dangerous substances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2014 2/17/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/21/2014 3/21/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-401, 3-402, 6-203, 7-101, 7-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM