Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Misuse of Interactive Computer Service (Grace's Law)
Sponsored by
Senator Kittleman
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from using an interactive computer service to maliciously engage in a specified course of conduct that inflicts serious emotional distress on a minor or places a minor in reasonable fear of death or serious bodily injury under specified circumstances; and defining terms.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0396
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {508972/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Favorable with Amendments {508972/1 Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 59
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-805 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM