Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Northern Snakehead Bowfishing License - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 708
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to adopt regulations governing the use of bowfishing gear; establishing a commercial northern snakehead bowfishing license; authorizing a licensee to catch for sale northern snakeheads in the tidal waters of the State using a bow and arrow attached to a retrieval line; prohibiting a licensee from fishing under the license under specified circumstances; establishing a specified application process for the license; establishing an annual fee of $15 for the license; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1387
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {224935/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-1)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 708
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2016 2/18/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {224935/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 51
House 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (140-1) 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 708
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-221, 4-701, 4-701.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM