Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - Disclosure
Sponsored by
Senator Ferguson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a person who makes a specified amount of independent expenditures or electioneering communications to register and file specified reports with the State Board of Elections within a specified time; requiring an independent expenditure or electioneering communication report to identify persons who made donations of a specified amount to the person making the independent expenditure or electioneering communication; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 38
Senate 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Referred Senate Rules 38
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-306, 13-307, 13-309.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM