Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Electronic Instant Bingo Machines - Regulation
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing a war veterans' organization or fraternal organization in Anne Arundel County to operate not more than five electronic instant bingo machines if the organization obtains a license for each machine on or before June 1, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1452
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-301.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM