Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Baltimore City Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for enhanced workers' compensation benefits for a Baltimore City deputy sheriff for a compensable permanent partial disability of less than a specified number of weeks; and providing that the Act applies only prospectively and may not be applied or interpreted to have any effect on or application to any claims arising before October 1, 2016.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2016 2/18/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 52
House 3/28/2016 3/23/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55A
(   9-628, 9-629 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page