Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Office of the Baltimore City Sheriff - Positions and Grievance Procedures
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Baltimore City Sheriff to appoint specified additional personnel under specified circumstances; increasing a specified annual expense allowance for specified deputy sheriffs; requiring the Baltimore City Sheriff, in consultation with the Baltimore Police Department and the Baltimore City Administration, to report to the General Assembly by December 31, 2016, on the logistics of transferring specified warrant service duties and the best practices employed by other jurisdictions in the service of warrants; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {298377/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
69
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2016 2/18/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {298377/1 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 69
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM