Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Redevelopment Areas
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone and Salling
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for specified construction material or warehousing equipment purchased for use in a specified target redevelopment area in Baltimore County under specified circumstances; requiring a buyer claiming the exemption to provide to the vendor evidence of eligibility issued by the Comptroller; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1533
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {569031/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {615462/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2016 2/18/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {569031/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 51
House 3/28/2016 3/28/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {615462/1 Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-232 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM