Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Evaluation of the Application of Minority Business Enterprise Program by the Public Service Commission
Sponsored by
Senator McFadden
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Transportation, the Governor's Office of Minority Affairs, and the Public Service Commission, in consultation with the Office of the Attorney General, to evaluate the feasibility and constitutionality of requiring the Commission to apply the provisions of a specified minority business enterprise program when exercising specified authority; and terminating the Act at the end of June 30, 2014.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1055
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator McFadden) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator McFadden) Adopted 44
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Referred Senate Rules 44
Senate 3/14/2013 3/15/2013 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Second Reading Passed 68
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM