Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Solar Water Heating Systems
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "solar water heating system" for purposes of the renewable energy portfolio standard to include systems that consist of specified concentrating solar thermal collectors under specified circumstances; and making a stylistic change.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1534
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Middleton) Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Referred Senate Rules 47
Senate 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/21/2013 3/21/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/27/2013 3/23/2013 Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 55
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/02/2013 4/02/2013 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/03/2013 4/03/2013 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM