Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
**Veto override
   SB1065 - 2020RS
   CH0001 - 2021RS
Title
Economic Development - Baltimore Symphony Orchestra - Funding and Reporting
Sponsored by
Senator King
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2021
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to appropriate certain amounts of money to the Baltimore Symphony Orchestra in fiscal years 2022 through 2026; requiring the Baltimore Symphony Orchestra to submit certain reports to the Governor and certain committees of the General Assembly on or before October 15 each year, beginning in 2022 and for the next 4 years; and repealing the termination of a certain provision of law requiring the Governor to appropriate a certain amount of money to the Baltimore Symphony Orchestra in fiscal years 2020 and 2021.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1658
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-3)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-29)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/15 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/22 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/9 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Overridden (32-14)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Overridden (95-39)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Economic Development - Baltimore Symphony Orchestra - Funding and Reporting
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development - Baltimore Symphony Orchestra - Funding and Reporting
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Third Reading Passed (42-3) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Appropriations 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (103-29) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/15 (Senator King) Adopted
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/22 (Senator King) Adopted
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/9 (Senator King) Adopted
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Overridden (32-14)
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Overridden (95-39)
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2021
Text - Chapter - Economic Development - Baltimore Symphony Orchestra - Funding and Reporting
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 3:00 PM
Click to return on the top page