Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on the Commemoration of the 100th Anniversary of the Passage of the 19th Amendment to the United States Constitution
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Benson, Conway, Forehand, Gladden, Jacobs, Jones-Rodwell, Kelley, King, Montgomery, Pugh, Dyson, Ferguson, Jennings, Pinsky, Reilly, Rosapepe, Simonaire, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on the Commemoration of the 100th Anniversary of the Passage of the 19th Amendment to the United States Constitution; requiring the Commission to take actions and make recommendations regarding commemoration of women's suffrage in Maryland; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2014, and annually thereafter for the next 5 years; terminating the Act after October 31, 2020; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1535
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {274930/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Referred Senate Rules 49
Senate 3/21/2013 3/22/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2013 3/22/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {274930/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 59
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 60
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/06/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Second Reading Passed 66
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM