Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - Preferences
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a preference program under the State procurement law for bids or proposals submitted by specified entities to provide goods or services to the Maryland Gaming and Lottery Control Commission; providing for the assignment of additional points or percentage price reductions, as specified, for bids or proposals to the Commission by specified certified business entities; establishing eligibility requirements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1574
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/01/2016 3/02/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-701 through 14-703 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM