Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Evaluate the Impact of Maryland's Proposal to Maintain the Medicare Waiver
Sponsored by
Senator Pipkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Evaluate the Impact of Maryland's Proposal to Maintain the Medicare Waiver; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study specified matters related to a specified waiver application; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor and specified standing committees of the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2014; terminating the Act after June 30, 2014; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 56
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 56
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Referred Finance 56
Senate 3/29/2013 3/29/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM