Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Prince George's County - Southern Area Indoor Aquatic Center
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 to extend the deadline for the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission to present evidence of the matching funds for grants for the Southern Area Indoor Aquatic Center; changing the location of the Southern Area Indoor Aquatic Center from Riverdale to Fort Washington; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1450
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
NOTE: The prior authorization was altered during the 2014 Session and was amended into the Capital Budget Bill (SB 171 ).
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/04/2014 3/05/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM