Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Statute of Limitations - Residential Leases Signed Under Seal
Sponsored by
Senator Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying the time period within which a civil action on a residential lease that has been signed under seal must be filed; and declaring that it is the intent of the General Assembly to clarify that an action for rent arrears under any kind of residential lease must be filed in compliance with specified provisions of law.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0994
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Statute of Limitations - Residential Leases Signed Under Seal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Statute of Limitations - Residential Leases Signed Under Seal
Senate 2/28/2017 3/01/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM