Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mental Health - Voluntary and Involuntary Admissions - Certification by Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Pugh, and Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Defining "psychiatric nurse practitioner" for purposes of specified provisions of law relating to the voluntary and involuntary admissions of individuals to specified facilities for the treatment of mental disorders; prohibiting a certificate signed by a psychiatric nurse practitioner for the involuntary admission of an individual to specified facilities for the treatment of a mental disorder from being used for an admission under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1561
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {537079/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Reassigned to Finance 35
Senate 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments {537079/1 Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 52
House 3/28/2016 3/23/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55A
House 4/05/2016 4/05/2016 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2016 4/05/2016 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-601, 10-616, 10-619 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM