Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Miller, Mathias, and Pinsky
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program to review prescription monitoring data for indications of misuse or abuse of a monitored prescription drug; requiring the Program to notify the appropriate health occupations board of a possible violation of law or breach of professional standards by a dispenser or prescriber only if the technical advisory committee makes a recommendation for referral and a certain finding; requiring the program to provide the health occupations board with the data necessary for an investigation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0088
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {677071/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {986881/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted (132-1)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Klausmeier, Jennings and Rosapepe)
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Senate 2/15/2018 2/16/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {677071/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Text - Third - Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 60
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 59
House 4/04/2018 4/05/2018 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {986881/1 Adopted 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted (132-1) 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Klausmeier, Jennings and Rosapepe) 65
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-2A-02, 21-2A-04, 21-2A-06, 21-2A-07 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM