Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Stormwater Remediation Fee - Application and Limitation
Sponsored by
Baltimore County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring that property owned by Baltimore County be charged a specified stormwater remediation fee unless the Baltimore County Board of Education holds the property in trust for the benefit of a school, the school system, or a community college; prohibiting a specified stormwater remediation fee charged to a commercial property in Baltimore County from exceeding 50% of the county property tax assessed on the property; limiting the stormwater remediation fee for a residential property charged by Baltimore County; etc.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2014 2/26/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
(   4-202.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page