Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement District
Sponsored by
Senator Conway (By Request - Baltimore City Administration) and Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, and Robinson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 642
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore to establish by ordinance a certain Tourism Improvement District; authorizing the Mayor and City Council to designate a Tourism Improvement District Association to provide certain services; requiring the Association to establish a certain financial plan for the District; prohibiting the Mayor and city Council from authorizing certain reductions in certain existing funding; providing that certain unspent funds be refunded to certain business owners in a certain manner; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1385
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement District
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {907673/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement District
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 642
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement District
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement District
Senate 2/15/2018 2/16/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Reassigned to Finance 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {907673/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement District
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Returned Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 642
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement District
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page