Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Sponsored by
Senators Peters and Guzzone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the formula used to apportion certain income to the State for certain corporations that carry on a trade or business within and outside the State; authorizing certain corporations to elect to use a certain formula to apportion certain income; requiring certain corporations to apportion certain income from certain intangible investments in a certain manner; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {409330/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-5)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {795360/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {175661/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {863828/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (65-67)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {563228/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (47-84)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {703227/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (50-81)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {703227/2 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (53-76)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-44)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-6)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Senate 2/15/2018 2/16/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {409330/1 Adopted 48B
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48B
Text - Third - Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (42-5) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means 50
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {795360/1 Adopted 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Floor Committee Amendment {175661/1 Adopted 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Floor Amendment {863828/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (65-67) 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Floor Amendment {563228/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (47-84) 62
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Floor Amendment {703227/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (50-81) 62
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Floor Amendment {703227/2 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (53-76) 62
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (88-44) 62
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (39-6) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Text - Chapter - Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM