Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Custody and Visitation
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the court, in any case in which the court determines child support, if there is no court order awarding custody and visitation of the child, to refer the parties to the resources available to assist them in establishing custody and visitation; and requiring the Child Support Enforcement Administration, when it has established a child support obligation and there is no court order awarding custody and visitation of the child, to refer the parties to the resources available to assist them in establishing custody and visitation.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Child Support - Custody and Visitation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Family Law - Child Support - Custody and Visitation
Senate 2/21/2017 2/22/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM