Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Registration - Exception for Municipal RTV Utility Vehicles - Town of Sykesville
Sponsored by
Senator Bates
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating an exception from motor vehicle registration requirements for municipal RTV utility vehicles in the Town of Sykesville, Carroll County; providing that a person who operates a municipal RTV utility vehicle in Sykesville may operate the vehicle only on specified roads, between dawn and dusk, and only if the vehicle is equipped with specified lighting; requiring a person who operates a municipal RTV utility vehicle in Sykesville to keep as far to the right of the roadway as feasible and to possess a driver's license; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Vehicle Registration - Exception for Municipal RTV Utility Vehicles - Town of Sykesville
Senate 2/21/2017 2/22/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-402, 21-104.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM