Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Baltimore City - Franklin Entrepreneurial and Apprenticeship Center
Sponsored by
Senator Jones-Rodwell
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 to alter the type of matching fund that may be provided by the Board of Directors of the Druid Heights Community Development Corporation for specified grants for the Franklin Entrepreneurial and Apprenticeship Center, located in Baltimore City; extending the deadline to June 1, 2015, for the grantee to present evidence of specified matching funds; providing that the grants may not terminate before June 1, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted 39
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Referred Senate Rules 39
Senate 3/06/2014 3/07/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2010, 2012 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM