Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Licenses
Sponsored by
Senator Jones-Rodwell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of Liquor License Commissioners for Baltimore City to issue a Class C beer, wine and liquor license in ward 5, precinct 1 of the 44th alcoholic beverages district in Baltimore City.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted 39
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Referred Senate Rules 39
Senate 3/19/2014 3/20/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 59
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/04/2014 4/04/2014 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Second Reading Passed 66
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 68
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM