Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Qualified Maryland Biotechnology Company - Definition
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Edwards, Feldman, Hough, King, Madaleno, McFadden, Serafini, and Young
Status
In the House - Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "qualified Maryland biotechnology company" to extend a specified period of time from a specified date that an active business may claim the biotechnology tax credit; and applying the Act to initial tax credit certificates issued after June 30, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1554
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/01/2016 3/02/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 48A
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 52
House 3/28/2016 3/28/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-725 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM