Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - BARCO Playhouse Theater
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $250,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Baltimore Arts Realty Corporation for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, site improvement, and capital equipping of the BARCO Playhouse Theater, located in Baltimore City; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1170
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2019 were amended into the State's Capital budget (SB 186). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended SB 186 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - BARCO Playhouse Theater
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - BARCO Playhouse Theater
Senate 2/15/2018 2/16/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM