Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Sale of Bedding by Merchants - Limitations
Sponsored by
Senator Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a merchant from selling or offering to sell a mattress or box spring to a consumer in the State unless a label is attached indicating whether the bedding is "all new material" or "used bedding" or "used material"; requiring a merchant who sells a new mattress or box spring to a consumer in the State to indicate on the consumer's receipt that the bedding is new; prohibiting a merchant from selling as new a mattress or box spring unless the mattress or box spring is made entirely from new material; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/23/2016 2/24/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/01/2016 3/02/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-1316 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM