Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a licensed direct-entry midwife is prohibited from assuming or continuing to take responsibility for a patient's pregnancy and birth care and is required to arrange for the orderly transfer of care of the patient; altering the circumstances under which a licensed direct-entry midwife is required to consult with a health care practitioner; requiring the State Board of Nursing, in consultation with stakeholders, to review and update as necessary the informed consent agreement at least every 4 years; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1437
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {784135/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act - Revisions
Senate 2/15/2018 2/16/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {784135/1 Adopted 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
Text - Third - Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act - Revisions
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 50
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 60
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Text - Chapter - Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act - Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-6C-03, 8-6C-04, 8-6C-07, 8-6C-08, 8-6C-09, 8-6C-10, 8-6C-13 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM