Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Highway Administration to erect an exempt highway-rail grade crossing plaque at each railroad grade crossing in the State that is no longer in use by a railroad; specifying that the design and placement of a plaque shall be erected in accordance with the Federal Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices; and exempting specified vehicles from the requirement to stop at specified railroad grade crossings if the railroad grade crossing has an exempt highway-rail grade crossing plaque.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1598
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {707976/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/23/2016 2/24/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/01/2016 3/02/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments {707976/1 Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/28/2016 3/23/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-703, 8-644 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM