Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Baltimore City - Transfer of License - Hardship Extension
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the holder of an alcoholic beverages license in Baltimore City or another appropriate interested party to make a written request to the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to extend the time authorized for the transfer of the license due to hardship; authorizing the Board to grant a specified time extension for the transfer of a specified license if the Board makes a hardship finding after a hearing; and limiting the time period to no more than 270 days for a specified extension approved by the Board.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {414836/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Baltimore City - Transfer of License - Hardship Extension
Senate 2/28/2017 3/01/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments {414836/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Baltimore City - Transfer of License - Hardship Extension
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 53
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 57
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 66
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (127-0) 68
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Baltimore City - Transfer of License - Hardship Extension
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 12-1705 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM