Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Garrett County – Regulation of Animals – Enforcement
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 701
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement applicable to Garrett County that a certain animal control officer enforce certain provisions; and requiring, in Garrett County, certain provisions to be enforced by the sheriff, a deputy authorized by the sheriff, or an animal control officer appointed by the county commissioners or the county commissioner's designee.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1734
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Garrett County – Regulation of Animals – Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Garrett County – Regulation of Animals – Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 701
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Garrett County – Regulation of Animals – Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Garrett County – Regulation of Animals – Enforcement
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable Adopted 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed 48
Text - Third - Garrett County – Regulation of Animals – Enforcement
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 50
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 701
Text - Chapter - Garrett County – Regulation of Animals – Enforcement
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM