Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Hotel and Special Hotel Concessionaire Licenses
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing in Prince George's County a special hotel license to be issued by the Board of License Commissioners to the owner or operator of a hotel that contains at least 250 bedrooms, specified exercise facilities, at least 15,000 square feet of conference space, specified restaurant facilities, and parking for 400 or more motor vehicles; and establishing a special hotel concessionaire license to be issued by the Board to persons who operate an establishment engaging in the daily sale of beer, wine and liquor on the premises; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   26-1013.1, 26-1013.2, 26-102, 26-1103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM