Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Somerset County - Community College - Eligibility of Students to Pay No Tuition or Fees
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that specified students residing in Somerset County may enroll full time in specified community colleges and pay no tuition or fees for up to 3 years if specified conditions are met; requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to pay 100% of in-county tuition and fees for specified eligible students; requiring a student to repay funds spent on the student's behalf to the Commission and county if the student is guilty of a felony; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1608
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Somerset County - Community College - Eligibility of Students to Pay No Tuition or Fees
Senate 2/28/2017 3/01/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-310 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM