Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council
Sponsored by
Senator Ferguson
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council in the Department of Juvenile Services; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Council; prohibiting a member of the Council from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; specifying the duties of the Council; authorizing the Council to request certain technical assistance; requiring the Council to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2021; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1524
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {388778/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {973223/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {173527/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments {388778/1 Adopted 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Floor Amendment {973223/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Floor Amendment {173527/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 66
Text - Third - Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM